Bethesda, MD, April 22, 2015–Space Partnership International, a provider of a wide range of management services to the space and satellite industries, announced that Roy Kampfer has joined the company as senior vice president of engineering.
Hauppauge, N.Y. – April 14, 2015 -- Globecomm announced that Jonathan Kirchner has joined the executive team as Senior Vice President of Corporate Strategy & Product Management. He will be reporting to Keith Hall, Chief Executive Office and will lead the development of Globecomm’s long-term, global corporate and product strategy.
Redmond, Wash., April 14, 2015 – Kymeta Corporation, a Seattle-based developer of metamaterials-based antenna technology, today announced that its board of directors has appointed Dr. Nathan Kundtz as CEO and Marc Stolzman as chief financial officer (CFO). Kundtz previously held the position of president and chief technology officer at Kymeta. Stolzman previously held the position of CFO at Zulily.
Izegem, Belgium, April 10, 2015–Skyline Communications, a provider of end-to-end multi-vendor network management and OSS software solutions for the broadcast, satellite, cable, telco and mobile industry, has appointed Steven Soenens as Product Marketing Director.
Carlsbad, Calif., April 8, 2015–ViaSat Inc. (NASDAQ: VSAT),has appointed Frank J. Biondi Jr. to its Board of Directors. Biondi will serve as a Class I Director effective immediately, with an initial term expiring at the Company’s 2015 annual meeting of stockholders.
Bangalore, India, April 6, 2015--Dr M Annadurai has assumed the office of Director, ISAC on April 1, 2015. He took over as Director, ISAC from Dr S K Shivakumar, who retired on March 31, 2015.
Betzdorf, Luxembourg, April 2, 2015--At their Annual General Meeting (AGM) held today in Betzdorf, Luxembourg shareholders of satellite operator SES elected Anne-Catherine Ries and Katrin Wehr-Seiter as new members of the Board. They replace René Steichen and Prof. Dr. Miriam Meckel.
Washington, D.C., April 1, 2015--Intelsat S.A. (NYSE:I) today announced the promotion of two seasoned executives to the company’s executive leadership team. Kurt Riegelman, 51, has been named Senior Vice President, Sales and Marketing while Michael J. DeMarco, 44, has been named Senior Vice President, Operation. The moves come as Stephen Spengler officially assumes the role of Chief Executive Officer on 1 April from Intelsat’s now executive chairman, Dave McGlade.
New York City, April 1, 2015--The World Teleport Association (WTA) announced the election of four new members of its Board of Directors for three-year terms beginning April 1, 2015: David Ball, Chief Technology Officer, NewSat Limited; Marzio Laurenti, Chief Executive Officer, Telespazio Brasil S.A.; Ben Vine, Vice President, Media and Broadcasting Solutions, PCCW Global and Alan Young, Chief Technology Officer, Encompass Digital Media.